Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eric Gerard Perkins

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne

Titular Bishop of Verrona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1916BornWest Saint Kilda
28 Jul 194024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
16 Nov 197256.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
16 Nov 197256.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Verrona
21 Feb 197356.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verrona
20 Aug 199175.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
27 May 199881.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for Eric Gerard Perkins:
Bishop Eric Gerard Perkins (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013