Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Francis Lyons

Deceased

Bishop of Sale, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1903Born
6 Jan 192724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
16 Mar 194441.1AppointedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
2 Jul 194441.4Ordained BishopBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
6 Aug 194441.5InstalledBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
8 Mar 195047.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
8 Mar 195047.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cabasa
11 Oct 195653.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sale, Australia
16 Jun 195754.4SucceededBishop of Sale, Australia
13 Aug 196764.6DiedBishop of Sale, Australia

MicroData Summary for Patrick Francis Lyons
Bishop Patrick Francis Lyons (born , died ) Bishop of Sale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelbourne

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1967, Page 388
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017