Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter John Elliott

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne, Australia

Titular Bishop of Manaccenser


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1943 Born
19 Feb 197329.3Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
30 Apr 200763.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
30 Apr 200763.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Manaccenser
15 Jun 200763.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Manaccenser
3 Nov 201875.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for Peter John Elliott (VIAF: 89070285)
Bishop Peter John Elliott (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick, Cathedral, Melbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Melbourne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2007
  • op/c1: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,434
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Nov 2018

Quantcast