Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Alipius Goold, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Melbourne, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1812Born
19 Jul 183522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
9 Jul 184734.6AppointedBishop of Melbourne, Australia
6 Aug 184835.7Ordained BishopBishop of Melbourne, Australia
8 Oct 184835.9InstalledBishop of Melbourne, Australia
31 Mar 187461.4AppointedArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia
11 Jun 188673.6DiedArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for James Alipius Goold (VIAF: 126580857)
Archbishop James Alipius Goold O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Melbourne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCork, Diocese of Cork, Ireland
Ordained PriestPerugia, Diocese of Perugia, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Cathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney
Death PlaceMelbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne
Buried Place (Original)Holy Soul's Chapel, St. Patrick's, Cathedral, Melbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 377
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 16 Feb 2018