Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Terence Robert Curtin

Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia

Titular Bishop of Cabarsussi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1945 Born
28 Aug 197126.1Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
7 Nov 201469.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
7 Nov 201469.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
17 Dec 201469.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi

MicroData Summary for Terence Robert Curtin
Bishop Terence Robert Curtin (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremorne

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Melbourne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 7 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,329

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast