Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Shane Anthony Mackinlay

Bishop of Sandhurst, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1965 Born
7 Sep 199025.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ballarat, Australia
6 Sep 199126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ballarat, Australia
23 Jul 201954.1AppointedBishop of Sandhurst, Australia
16 Oct 201954.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sandhurst, Australia

MicroData Summary for Shane Anthony Mackinlay
Bishop Shane Anthony Mackinlay (born ) Bishop of Sandhurst

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrunswick, Archdiocese of Melbourne
Ordained DeaconSt. Patrick’s, Cathedral, Ballarat, Diocese of Ballarat
Ordained PriestSt. Alipius’, Church, Ballarat East, Diocese of Ballarat
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Bendigo, Diocese of Sandhurst

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sandhurst.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2019
  • ob: CB, 23 Jul 2019
  • mn: CB, 10 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 4 Nov 2019

Quantcast