Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark Stuart Edwards, O.M.I.

Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne

Titular Bishop of Garba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1959 BornBalikpapan, Indonesia
17 Feb 198424.6ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
16 Aug 198627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
7 Nov 201455.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
7 Nov 201455.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Garba
17 Dec 201455.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Garba

MicroData Summary for Mark Stuart Edwards:
Bishop Mark Stuart Edwards O.M.I. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Melbourne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 7 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,330

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015