Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Francis Corbett

Deceased

Bishop of Sale, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1834Born
29 May 185823.8Ordained PriestPriest of Limerick, Ireland
186328.4IncardinatedPriest of Melbourne, Australia
13 May 188752.8AppointedBishop of Sale, Australia
25 Aug 188753.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sale, Australia
29 May 191277.8DiedBishop of Sale, Australia

MicroData Summary for James Francis Corbett
Bishop James Francis Corbett (born , died ) Bishop of Sale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick, Diocese of Limerick, Ireland

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 492
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017