Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel Mannix

Deceased

Archbishop of Melbourne

Bishop of Australia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1864BornCharleville, Ireland
9 Jun 189026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cloyne, Ireland
1 Jul 191248.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Melbourne, Australia
1 Jul 191248.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pharsalus
6 Oct 191248.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pharsalus
191752.8AppointedBishop of Australia, Military
6 May 191753.1SucceededArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia
6 Nov 196399.6DiedArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for Daniel Mannix:
Archbishop Daniel Mannix (born , died ) Archbishop of Melbourne

  • a priest for 73.4 years
  • a bishop for 51.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015