Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matthew Beovich

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Adelaide


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1896BornCarlton
22 Dec 192226.7Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
11 Dec 193943.7AppointedArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia
7 Apr 194044.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia
1 May 197175.1RetiredArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia
24 Oct 198185.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Adelaide, Australia

MicroData Summary for Matthew Beovich:
Archbishop Matthew Beovich (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Adelaide

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013