Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Phelan

Deceased

Bishop of Sale, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1856Born
26 May 188832.3Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
12 Nov 191256.8AppointedBishop of Sale, Australia
2 Mar 191357.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sale, Australia
5 Jan 192569.0DiedBishop of Sale, Australia

MicroData Summary for Patrick Phelan (VIAF: 92146287)
Bishop Patrick Phelan (born , died ) Bishop of Sale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJohnstown, Ireland

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast