Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Joseph Connors

Bishop Emeritus of Ballarat


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1937 BornMordialloc
23 Jul 196124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
30 Mar 198750.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
30 Mar 198750.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Temuniana
21 May 198750.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Temuniana
30 May 199760.2AppointedBishop of Ballarat, Australia
23 Jul 199760.4InstalledBishop of Ballarat, Australia
1 Aug 201275.4RetiredBishop of Ballarat, Australia

MicroData Summary for Peter Joseph Connors:
Bishop Peter Joseph Connors (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ballarat

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ballarat.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,412
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013