Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Andrew Comensoli

Archbishop of Melbourne, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1964 Born
22 May 199228.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wollongong, Australia
20 Apr 201147.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
20 Apr 201147.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Numidia
8 Jun 201147.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Numidia
27 Feb 201449.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sydney, Australia
12 Nov 201450.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Sydney, Australia
20 Nov 201450.6AppointedBishop of Broken Bay, Australia
12 Dec 201450.7InstalledBishop of Broken Bay, Australia
29 Jun 201854.2AppointedArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia
1 Aug 201854.3InstalledArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for Peter Andrew Comensoli
Archbishop Peter Andrew Comensoli (born ) Archbishop of Melbourne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBulli, New South Wales
Ordained BishopSaint Mary, Cathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Melbourne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Apr 2011
  • op/ob: CB, 20 Apr 2011
  • c2: CB, 8 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,073
  • ab: Website of the Diocese, 27 Feb 2014
  • r: CB, 28 Sep 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2018
  • i: CB, 29 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast