Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthur Francis Fox

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1904BornMelbourne
13 Jul 193025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
11 Oct 195652.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
11 Oct 195652.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhinocorura
20 Jan 195752.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhinocorura
29 Nov 196763.2AppointedBishop of Sale, Australia
31 Jan 196863.4InstalledBishop of Sale, Australia
25 Feb 198176.4RetiredBishop of Sale, Australia
16 Feb 199792.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Sale, Australia

MicroData Summary for Arthur Francis Fox:
Bishop Arthur Francis Fox (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sale

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015