Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Joseph Carr

Deceased

Archbishop of Melbourne, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1839Born
22 May 186627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tuam, Ireland
12 Jun 188344.0AppointedBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
26 Aug 188344.2Ordained BishopBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
16 Nov 188647.5AppointedArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia
11 Jun 188748.0InstalledArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia
191272.6AppointedBishop of Australia, Military
191777.6ResignedBishop of Australia, Military
6 May 191777.9DiedArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Carr (VIAF: 42687741)
Archbishop Thomas Joseph Carr (born , died ) Archbishop of Melbourne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLakeview, Archdiocese of Tuam, Ireland
Ordained BishopS. Nicolas, Pro-Cathderal, Galway, Diocese of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 282, and Page 377
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017