Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Patrick O’Collins

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ballarat


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1892BornPort Melbourne
23 Dec 192230.7Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
11 Feb 193037.8AppointedBishop of Geraldton, Australia
11 May 193038.1Ordained BishopBishop of Geraldton, Australia
23 Dec 194149.7AppointedBishop of Ballarat, Australia
1 May 197179.0RetiredBishop of Ballarat, Australia
25 Nov 198391.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ballarat, Australia

MicroData Summary for James Patrick O’Collins:
Bishop James Patrick O’Collins (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ballarat

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 53.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015