Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Timothy Costelloe, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Perth, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1954 Born
8 Sep 198531.5Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Oct 198632.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Apr 200753.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
30 Apr 200753.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cluain Iraird
15 Jun 200753.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cluain Iraird
20 Feb 201258.0AppointedArchbishop of Perth, Australia
21 Mar 201258.1InstalledArchbishop of Perth, Australia

MicroData Summary for Timothy Costelloe
Archbishop Timothy Costelloe S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Perth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEast Melbourne

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Perth.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,435
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017