Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Barry

Deceased

Bishop of Goulburn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1875BornCoolbane, Freemount, Ireland
18 Jun 189924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
1 Mar 192448.7AppointedBishop of Goulburn, Australia
29 Jun 192449.0Ordained BishopBishop of Goulburn, Australia
22 Mar 193862.8DiedBishop of Goulburn, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Barry:
Bishop John Barry (born , died ) Bishop of Goulburn

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1939
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013