Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luc Julian Matthys

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Armidale, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1935Born
2 Dec 196126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Johannesburg, South Africa
197640.6IncardinatedPriest of Melbourne, Australia
17 Mar 199963.8AppointedBishop of Armidale, Australia
14 May 199964.0Ordained BishopBishop of Armidale, Australia
7 Dec 201176.5RetiredBishop of Armidale, Australia
26 Jan 202185.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Armidale, Australia

MicroData Summary for Luc Julian Matthys
Bishop Luc Julian Matthys (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Armidale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrongen, Belgium
Ordained BishopSaint Mary and Saint Joseph, Cathedral, Armidale, Diocese of Armidale
Death PlaceTamworth, N.S.W.

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: CB, 7 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,553
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 26 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 26 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jan 2021

Quantcast