Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of La Plata

Archidioecesis Platensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Héctor Rubén Aguer, Archbishop
  • Nicolás Baisi, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Alberto Germán Bochatey Chaneton, O.S.A., Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 April 1934
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 4,652 (1,796 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arzolap.org.ar/
  • Mailing Address: Calle 14, n. 1009, 1900 La Plata [Buenos Aires], Argentina
  • Telephone: (0221) 425-1656, 483-7627
  • Fax: 425-8269

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of La Plata
15 February 1897ErectedArchdiocese of Buenos Aires Diocese of La Plata (erected)
20 April 1934Territory LostDiocese of La Plata Diocese of Azul (erected)
20 April 1934Territory LostDiocese of La Plata Diocese of Bahía Blanca (erected)
20 April 1934Territory LostDiocese of La Plata Diocese of Mercedes (erected)
Archdiocese of La Plata
20 April 1934ElevatedDiocese of La Plata Archdiocese of La Plata
3 March 1947Territory LostArchdiocese of La Plata
Diocese of Mercedes
Diocese of San Nicolás de los Arroyos (erected)
11 February 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of La Plata Diocese of Lomas de Zamora (erected)
11 February 1957Territory LostDiocese of Bahía Blanca
Archdiocese of La Plata
Diocese of Mar del Plata (erected)
11 February 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of La Plata Diocese of Morón (erected)
11 February 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of La Plata
Diocese of San Nicolás de los Arroyos
Diocese of San Isidro (erected)
10 April 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of La Plata
Diocese of Lomas de Zamora
Diocese of Avellaneda (erected)
19 June 1976Territory LostDiocese of Avellaneda
Archdiocese of La Plata
Diocese of Quilmes (erected)
27 March 1980Territory LostArchdiocese of La Plata
Diocese of Mar del Plata
Diocese of Chascomús (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of La Plata
19502,740,0003,500,00078.3%3173756923,9596242,503167ap1951
1966670,000700,00095.7%118731913,50711759564ap1967
1970730,000770,00094.8%120781983,68611260069ap1971
1976750,000800,00093.8%115701854,05418655056ap1977
1980793,000843,00094.1%117701874,240510155072ap1981
1990642,550755,94085.0%105471524,22766143564ap1991
1999709,000836,00084.8%95391345,29155435666ap2000
2000716,000845,00084.7%92421345,34355736266ap2001
2001648,647763,11585.0%94481424,567512035664ap2002
2002617,596726,58385.0%96441404,411511437365ap2003
2003637,500750,00085.0%106511574,060512037365ap2004
2004637,500750,00085.0%106511574,060512737565ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 17 Apr 2013