Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauricio Eugenio Magliano, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1920Born
28 Sep 194828.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
12 Jun 196141.3AppointedBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina
10 Sep 196141.6Ordained BishopBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina
1 Oct 196141.6InstalledBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina
31 May 197454.3DiedBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Mauricio Eugenio Magliano
Bishop Mauricio Eugenio Magliano S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Río Gallegos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Isidro

  • a priest for 25.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast