Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernesto Segura

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Carpi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1914Born
29 Oct 193925.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 196247.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
7 Apr 196247.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpi
29 Apr 196247.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpi
13 Mar 197257.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Segura
Bishop Ernesto Segura (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMar del Plata

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast