Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Rubén Martinez

Bishop of Posadas, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1953 Born
22 Dec 197926.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 199441.0AppointedBishop of Reconquista, Argentina
19 Mar 199441.1Ordained BishopBishop of Reconquista, Argentina
25 Nov 200047.8AppointedBishop of Posadas, Argentina
10 Mar 200148.1InstalledBishop of Posadas, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Rubén Martinez
Bishop Juan Rubén Martinez (born ) Bishop of Posadas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicente López

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Posadas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast