Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Victor Manuel Fernández

Archbishop of La Plata, Argentina

Note/Previous Titular See: (Pontificia Universidad Catolia S. Maria de los B.A.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1962 Born
21 Dec 198523.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Villa de la Concepción del Río Cuarto, Argentina
15 Aug 198624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Villa de la Concepción del Río Cuarto, Argentina
20 May 201148.8AppointedRector
13 May 201350.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tiburnia
15 Jun 201350.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tiburnia
24 Apr 201855.7CeasedRector
2 Jun 201855.8AppointedArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
16 Jun 201855.9InstalledArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Victor Manuel Fernández (VIAF: 87690112)
Archbishop Victor Manuel Fernández (born ) Archbishop of La Plata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcira Gigena, Archdiocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of La Plata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 May 2013
  • c34: CB, 20 May 2013
  • c4: CB, 15 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,803
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2018
  • i: CB, 4 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jun 2018

Quantcast