Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Horacio Ponce de Léon

Deceased

Bishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1914BornNavarro
17 Dec 193824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
9 Jun 196248.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salta, Argentina
9 Jun 196248.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhaedestus
15 Aug 196248.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhaedestus
28 Apr 196652.1AppointedBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina
18 Jun 196652.3InstalledBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina
11 Jul 197763.3DiedBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Carlos Horacio Ponce de Léon:
Bishop Carlos Horacio Ponce de Léon (born , died ) Bishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013