Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jorge Mayer

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bahía Blanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1915BornSan Miguel Arcángel
23 Mar 194024.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 195741.3AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa, Argentina
9 Jun 195741.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Rosa, Argentina
29 Jun 195741.6InstalledBishop of Santa Rosa, Argentina
31 May 197256.5AppointedArchbishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
21 Jul 197256.6InstalledArchbishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
31 May 199175.5RetiredArchbishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
25 Dec 201095.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bahía Blanca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Mayer:
Archbishop Jorge Mayer (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bahía Blanca

  • a priest for 70.7 years
  • a bishop for 53.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015