Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejandro Schell

Deceased

Bishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1897Born
13 Dec 192225.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Plata, Argentina
11 Feb 195759.3IncardinatedPriest of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
14 Feb 195860.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
14 Feb 195860.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Birtha
20 Apr 195860.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Birtha
10 Apr 196365.5SucceededBishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
7 Sep 197274.9DiedBishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Schell
Bishop Alejandro Schell (born , died ) Bishop of Lomas de Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeewald, Saratov, Diocese of Tiraspol, Moldova
Ordained PriestCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Death PlaceArgüello

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 17 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Feb 2017