Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Morón

Dioecesis Moronensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 11 February 1957
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 130 (50 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Nuestra Senora del Buen Viaje 936, 1708 Moron [Buenos Aires], Argentina
  • Telephone: (011) 4629-3143
  • Fax: 4627-6892

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
11 February 1957ErectedArchdiocese of La Plata Diocese of Morón (erected)
10 April 1961Territory LostDiocese of Morón
Diocese of San Isidro
Diocese of San Martín (erected)
18 July 1969Territory LostDiocese of Lomas de Zamora
Diocese of Morón
Diocese of San Justo (erected)
13 May 1997Territory LostDiocese of Morón Diocese of Merlo-Moreno (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
19661,090,0001,150,00094.8%731041776,15811041667ap1967
1970730,000773,12594.4%64601245,88710226049ap1971
1976900,000950,00094.7%61591207,50010525355ap1977
19801,044,0001,215,00085.9%59611208,700113625961ap1981
19901,275,0001,407,00090.6%88521409,1071416926772ap1991*
1999560,000710,00078.9%5826846,66625369952ap2000
2000576,000720,00080.0%5628846,857293812152ap2001
2001580,000725,00080.0%5726836,987303412252ap2002
2002550,000698,00078.8%5825836,626313312252ap2003
2003548,500670,00081.9%5820787,032342811952ap2004
2004511,000655,00078.0%5819776,636343612352ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 27 Feb 2014