Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Walter Galán Barry

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of La Plata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1925BornNueve de Julio
19 Sep 195328.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 198155.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Morón, Argentina
11 Feb 198155.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cediae
25 Mar 198155.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cediae
8 May 199165.9AppointedArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
27 Jul 199166.2InstalledArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
12 Jun 200075.0RetiredArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
25 Jan 200377.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of La Plata, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Carlos Walter Galán Barry:
Archbishop Carlos Walter Galán Barry (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of La Plata

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013