Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Avellaneda-Lanús

Dioecesis Avellanediensis-Lanusenis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Rubén Oscar Frassia, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 24 April 2001
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 98 (37 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Ameghino 907, B1870CVS Avellaneda [Buenos Aires], Argentina
  • Telephone: (011)4222-4381, 4222-5184

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Avellaneda
10 April 1961ErectedArchdiocese of La Plata
Diocese of Lomas de Zamora
Diocese of Avellaneda (erected)
19 June 1976Territory LostDiocese of Avellaneda
Archdiocese of La Plata
Diocese of Quilmes (erected)
Diocese of Avellaneda-Lanús
24 April 2001Name ChangedDiocese of Avellaneda
Diocese of Lomas de Zamora
Diocese of Avellaneda-Lanús

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Avellaneda
1965900,0001,200,00075.0%62228410,7146121238ap1967
19701,250,000.0%605011005025039ap1971
19741,061,9001,170,00090.8%50409011,79814724048ap1977
1980368,000410,00089.8%3020507,360219520ap1981
1990362,000375,00096.5%2017379,7832810522ap1991
1999280,000400,00070.0%2717446,363279225ap2000
2000280,000400,00070.0%2817456,2222307726ap2001
Diocese of Avellaneda-Lanús
2001700,000900,00077.8%4229719,859163014642ap2002
2002547,000782,15069.9%5627836,590163315348ap2003
2003549,710785,30070.0%6128896,176193415448ap2004
2004558,950798,50070.0%4828767,354193415548ap2005
2006547,000782,14069.9%6726935,881262912948ap2007
2012635,588794,48580.0%5820788,14823239550ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013