Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Esteban González

Auxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Alesa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1966 Born
7 Dec 199226.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Plata, Argentina
5 Jun 202053.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
5 Jun 202053.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Alesa
15 Sep 202054.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alesa

MicroData Summary for Jorge Esteban González
Bishop Jorge Esteban González (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of La Plata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Plata, Archdiocese of La Plata
Ordained BishopInmaculada Concepción, Cathedral, La Plata, Archdiocese of La Plata

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of La Plata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2020
  • c1: CB, 5 Jun 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 Aug 2020
  • c3+: CB, 14 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Sep 2020

Quantcast