Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio José Plaza

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of La Plata, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1909Born
21 Dec 193425.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Plata, Argentina
16 May 195040.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Azul, Argentina
16 May 195040.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Doberus
25 Jul 195040.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Doberus
28 Aug 195343.6AppointedBishop of Azul, Argentina
31 Oct 195343.8InstalledBishop of Azul, Argentina
14 Nov 195545.8AppointedArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
17 Dec 195545.9InstalledArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
18 Dec 198575.9RetiredArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
11 Aug 198777.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of La Plata, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Antonio José Plaza
Archbishop Antonio José Plaza (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of La Plata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMar del Plata

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Feb 2017