Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Alberti

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1865Born
20 Dec 189530.7Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
3 Mar 189933.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
3 Mar 189933.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Siunia
9 Apr 189934.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siunia
1917¹51.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
13 Jul 192156.2AppointedBishop of La Plata, Argentina
12 Oct 192156.5InstalledBishop of La Plata, Argentina
20 Apr 193469.0AppointedArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
27 Jun 193873.2DiedArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Alberti (VIAF: 46446040)
Archbishop Francisco Alberti (born , died ) Archbishop of La Plata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopS. Pontien, La Plata, Diocese of La Plata

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 522
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017