Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Pascual Chimento

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1887BornFlorencio Varela
17 Apr 191123.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Plata, Argentina
29 Sep 192841.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
29 Sep 192841.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sela
21 Dec 192841.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sela
13 Sep 193447.2AppointedBishop of Mercedes, Argentina
26 Oct 193851.3AppointedArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
9 Dec 193851.4InstalledArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
25 Dec 194659.4DiedArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Pascual Chimento:
Archbishop Juan Pascual Chimento (born , died ) Archbishop of La Plata

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015