Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Héctor Rubén Aguer

Archbishop Emeritus of La Plata, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1943 Born
25 Nov 197229.5Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
26 Feb 199248.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
26 Feb 199248.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamdia
4 Apr 199248.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamdia
26 Jun 199855.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of La Plata, Argentina
12 Jun 200057.0SucceededArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
2 Jun 201875.0RetiredArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Héctor Rubén Aguer (VIAF: 18456884)
Archbishop Héctor Rubén Aguer (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of La Plata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of La Plata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,665
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 5 Jun 2018

Quantcast