Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Rau

Deceased

Bishop of Mar del Plata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1899BornCoronel Suárez
23 Dec 192223.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 195151.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
20 Mar 195151.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Voncaria
1 Jul 195151.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Voncaria
23 Oct 195455.1AppointedBishop of Resistencia, Argentina
5 Nov 195556.1InstalledBishop of Resistencia, Argentina
13 Mar 195757.5AppointedBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
22 Jul 195757.8InstalledBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
11 Aug 197171.9DiedBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Enrique Rau:
Bishop Enrique Rau (born , died ) Bishop of Mar del Plata

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013