Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Maria Cavallero

Deceased

Bishop of Minas, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1899Born
7 Apr 192828.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 195252.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salto, Uruguay
16 Jul 195252.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Uthina
26 Oct 195253.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uthina
20 Dec 195556.2AppointedBishop of Melo, Uruguay
9 Jul 196060.8AppointedBishop of Minas, Uruguay
29 May 196363.7DiedBishop of Minas, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for José Maria Cavallero
Bishop José Maria Cavallero (born , died ) Bishop of Minas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMercedes

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast