Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Isidro

Dioecesis Sancti Isidori in Argentina



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 11 February 1957
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 1,379 (532 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Av. Libertador Gen. San Martin 16199, B1642CKI San Isidro [Buenos Aires], Argentina
  • Telephone: (011)4743.1862
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
11 February 1957ErectedArchdiocese of La Plata
Diocese of San Nicolás de los Arroyos
Diocese of San Isidro (erected)
10 April 1961Territory LostDiocese of Morón
Diocese of San Isidro
Diocese of San Martín (erected)
27 March 1976Territory LostDiocese of San Isidro
Diocese of San Nicolás de los Arroyos
Diocese of Zárate-Campana (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966900,000950,00094.7%69941635,52114041237ap1967
19701,000,0001,100,00090.9%60741347,46210942940ap1971
1976875,023928,96694.2%61931545,68113740043ap1977
1980810,000922,00087.9%67701375,912110935039ap1981
1990950,0001,050,00090.5%114461605,93748230060ap1991
19991,006,0001,035,00097.2%120401606,287157330063ap2000
20001,006,0001,035,00097.2%122401626,209187530063ap2001
20011,006,0001,036,00097.1%123401636,171187525063ap2002
2002987,0001,011,00097.6%121401616,130205923063ap2003
2003987,0001,011,00097.6%119401596,207235930063ap2004
2004986,0001,010,00097.6%123351586,240225422063ap2005
20101,091,0001,145,00095.3%123221457,524334110066ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 18 Nov 2014