Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Alfredo Aducci

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mercedes, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Musti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1917Born
21 Dec 194023.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 196043.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mercedes, Argentina
28 May 196043.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti
14 Aug 196043.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Musti
3 May 196245.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mercedes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Vicente Alfredo Aducci
Bishop Vicente Alfredo Aducci (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mercedes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAzul

  • a priest for 21.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast