Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Antonio Mestre

Bishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1968 Born
2 Aug 199627.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mar del Plata, Argentina
16 May 199728.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mar del Plata, Argentina
18 Jul 201748.8AppointedBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
26 Aug 201748.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Antonio Mestre
Bishop Gabriel Antonio Mestre (born ) Bishop of Mar del Plata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMar del Plata, Diocese of Mar del Plata
Ordained DeaconSantos Pedro y Cecilia, Cathedral, Mar del Plata, Diocese of Mar del Plata
Ordained PriestSantos Pedro y Cecilia, Cathedral, Mar del Plata, Diocese of Mar del Plata
Ordained BishopSantos Pedro y Cecilia, Cathedral, Mar del Plata, Diocese of Mar del Plata

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mar del Plata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2017
  • od/c01/ob: CB, 18 Jul 2017
  • c2+: CB, 19 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Aug 2017