Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Argentino

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450Born
24 Aug 150656.6AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
10 Mar 151161.1Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 151161.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
23 Aug 151161.6DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Argentino
Francesco Cardinal Argentino (born 1450, died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice

  • a cardinal for .4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1511
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast