Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Paolo de Marchi, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Sura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1838Born
1854²15.0ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
1865²26.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
13 Feb 188950.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}, China
13 Feb 188950.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
10 Nov 188950.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sura
30 Aug 190162.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo de Marchi
Bishop Pietro Paolo de Marchi O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Vito, Diocese of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
Ordained BishopPeking
Death PlaceTsinanfu

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 530
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,889, Number 54
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast