Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Pellegrini

Bishop of Concordia-Pordenone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1953 BornMonteforte d’Alpone
2 Jun 197925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Verona, Italy
25 Feb 201157.3AppointedBishop of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy
26 Mar 201157.4Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy
10 Apr 201157.4InstalledBishop of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pellegrini:
Bishop Giuseppe Pellegrini (born ) Bishop of Concordia-Pordenone

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Concordia-Pordenone.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,980

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013