Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria (Angelo Pietro) Bressa, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1742Born
6 Apr 176522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Jul 177937.2AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
18 Jul 177937.2Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
13 Jan 181774.7DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria (Angelo Pietro) Bressa
Bishop Giuseppe Maria (Angelo Pietro) Bressa O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 178
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,779, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast