Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo d’Ottonello

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Apr 1293AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
21 Dec 1293Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
10 Dec 1317DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo d’Ottonello
Bishop Giacomo d’Ottonello (died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPalace, Aquileia

  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,790
  • nm: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast