Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Muccin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belluno e Feltre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1899BornSan Giovanni di Casarsa
22 Sep 192323.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 May 194949.4AppointedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
19 Jun 194949.5Ordained BishopBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
1 Sep 197575.7RetiredBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
27 Aug 199191.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Belluno e Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Muccin:
Bishop Gioacchino Muccin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belluno e Feltre

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015