Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sennen Corrà

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1924Born
29 Jun 194722.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 May 197651.3AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
6 Jun 197651.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
19 Jul 198964.5AppointedBishop of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy
16 Sep 200075.7RetiredBishop of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy
25 Apr 200580.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sennen Corrà
Bishop Sennen Corrà (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Concordia-Pordenone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalizzole

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast