Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1328AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
1329²Ordained BishopBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
5 Apr 1331AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
23 Mar 1333DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guido
Bishop Guido (died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 404, and Page 201
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,923

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast