Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alvise Maria Gabrieli

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1727BornVenise
19 Sep 175023.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 175831.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
30 Nov 175831.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Famagusta
6 Apr 176133.5AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
12 Jul 177951.8AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
19 Jul 178557.8DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alvise Maria Gabrieli
Bishop Alvise Maria Gabrieli (born , died ) Bishop of Vicenza

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 178, and Page 212
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 441
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1758, Number 31
  • ob/c2+: AT, 14 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Mar 2016