Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Premoli

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornCrema
25 Jul 166232.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 166838.2AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
22 Apr 166838.3Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
Oct 1692³62.7DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Premoli:
Bishop Agostino Premoli , Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 159
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015